KNIGHTS COMMUNITY GYM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mobilizing the community through exercise sport and nutrition. ?A mobile fitness and martial arts service ?Working with schools, youth centres, community groups, councils and health services, to increase activity levels, and reduce obesity and cardiovascular disease within the community. ?Giving children and adults access to health, fitness and nutritional services within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICKY CHAMBERS | Chair | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE MARIA HOLROYD | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LUCY EMMA KRISTINE HAYES | Trustee | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2015 | 01/04/2016 | 01/04/2017 | 01/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £1.42k | £14.22k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £798 | £1.44k | £7.61k | £10.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £923 | £1.35k | £2.42k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 482 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1212 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1577 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 MAY 2014 AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
(1)THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF SPORT, MARTIAL ARTS AND PHYSICAL TRAINING. (2)TO HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 26
Crondall House
Fontley Way
Roehampton
London
SW15 4NE
- Phone:
- 07732837777
- Email:
- knightsgym@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
knightscommunitygym.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window