OIC EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1156799
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The OIC Education Trust runs Oldham Islamic College to provide education for both males and females - leading to University Level Qualifications. To this end, our activities include: Full-time and Part-Time Alim/Alima Courses Deen Essentials & Short Courses for young & adult Arabic, Fiqh and Calligraphy Tajweed and Qiraah Hifzul-Quran NVQs GCSEs and A-Levels

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017

Total income: £229,270
Total expenditure: £226,397

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 2014: CIO registration
  • 14 January 2022: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 14 January 2022: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £267.71k £290.87k £229.27k
Total expenditure £261.60k £333.64k £226.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted