THE HOLLIE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation increases knowledge of NP-C amongst the public and aids research into the disease. It provides grant funding to organisations with a common interest (such as those that provide support or services specifically relating to aspects of NP-C or who support research into the condition) and individuals affected by NP-C where there is a recognised social or medical need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 March 2014: Standard registration
- 17 April 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1144406 NIEMANN-PICK UK
- HOPE FOR HOLLIE (Working name)
- HOPE FOR HOLLIE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.45k | £14.26k | £9.88k | £5.47k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.53k | £23.80k | £16.62k | £14.86k | £3.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF NIEMANN PICK TYPE C AND TO MAKE A POSITIVE DIFFERENCE TO THOSE AFFECTED AND THEIR FAMILIES BY AIDING RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THROUGH THE GIVING OF GRANTS, BOTH TO AFFECTED INDIVIDUALS AND TO ORGANISATIONS WITH A COMMON INTEREST.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window