Accounts and annual returns MPGN/DDD SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1157821
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 24 April 2024 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 18 May 2023 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 06 January 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required