Financial history MPGN/DDD SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1157821
Charity reporting is overdue by 158 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Total gross income £100 £691 £717 £29 £1.21k
Total expenditure £1.13k £1.63k £786 £908 £964
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A