MPGN/DDD SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give help, support and information to patients and families effected by MPGN/DDD kidney diseases by using Website page and for future open family days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lewis Brimble | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Liam Gibbs | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Gibbs | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE BRIMBLE HE RGN | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ROSE WHITTALL | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £691 | £717 | £29 | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £1.63k | £786 | £908 | £964 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 155 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 155 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 May 2023 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 January 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2014
Charitable objects
1)TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY MEMBRANOPROLIFERATIVE GLOMERULONEPHRITIS AND DENSE DEPOSIT DISEASE AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE,INFORMATION AND ADVOCACY;AND2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND THE MEDICAL PROFESSION ON THE SUBJECT OF MEMBRANOPROLIFERATIVE GLOMERULONEPHRITIS AND DENSE DEPOSIT DISEASE
Contact information
- Address:
-
270 Thimblemill Road
Smethwick
B67 6LS
- Phone:
- 01214202109
- Email:
- info@mpgnddd.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window