THE CHARITY OF MARY ANN RAWSON FOR WINCOBANK SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the land and buildings known as Upper Wincobank Chapel for undenominational Christian worship and community activities that are open to all in the local and wider community regardless of faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 May 2014: CIO registration
- UPPER WINCOBANK CHAPEL/WINCOBANK SCHOOL TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liamarjit Bhogal | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wilson | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Keith Lemm | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Rea | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev Inderjit Bhogal | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|||||
MARGARET WOOD | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET PALMER | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Francis | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.61k | £20.87k | £92.67k | £84.61k | £102.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.03k | £16.86k | £58.43k | £84.11k | £136.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.80k | N/A | £4.00k | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP (BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTION AS TO DENOMINATION) AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. (B) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
132 Wincobank Avenue
SHEFFIELD
S5 6BB
- Phone:
- 07980143776
- Email:
- uwuchapel@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window