THE JIGSAW PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help young people, within the context of Christian values, through the provision of recreational, educational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life and providing support and activities which develop their skill capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £3.89k | £10.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.64k | £1.73k | £9.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 02 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 07 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 15 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF CHRISTIAN VALUES, THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILL CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window