Accounts and annual returns ASSEMBLIES OF THE FIRST BORN
Charity number: 1156317

Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 November 2024 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 272 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2021
(These accounts |
10 October 2022 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 August 2022 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 22 August 2022 | 448 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window