Financial history ASSEMBLIES OF THE FIRST BORN

Charity number: 1156317
Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £344.60k £329.02k £260.88k £246.82k £218.66k
Total expenditure £326.33k £346.14k £230.40k £215.91k £190.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A