HIGHMORE'S EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATIONAL AWARDS FOR INDIVIDUALS UP TO AGE OF 25; RESIDING IN WAITBY AND SMARDALE PARISH COUNCIL, CUMBRIA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cumbria
Governance
- 21 August 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Atkinson | Chair | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill Dargue | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Anne Harrington | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Body | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Pedley | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIANE TAYLOR | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £1.59k | £1.62k | £1.65k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £5.90k | £1.74k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 February 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 15 FEBRUARY 1910 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF THE 29 NOVEMBER 1912 AND 16 MAY 1977
Charitable objects
1. PROVIDING O ASSISTING IN THE PRIVISION AT ANY PRIMARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL IN THE DISTRICT O EDEN WHICH CHILDREN AND RESIDENT IN WAITBY AND SMARDALE ATTEND OF SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS FO A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 2. IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN WAITBY AND SMARDALE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WAITBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wharton House
Waitby
Kirkby Stephen
Cumbria
CA17 4HF
- Phone:
- 01768372714
- Email:
- mary_anne135@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window