Financial history CARDIFF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1155885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £876.11k £858.88k £995.69k £720.58k £784.10k
Total expenditure £685.92k £695.11k £806.62k £797.34k £822.53k
Income from government contracts £95.00k £95.00k £104.00k £110.50k £110.00k
Income from government grants £147.95k £275.87k £329.20k £213.22k £165.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £565.46k £668.55k £719.56k £388.82k £458.67k
Income - Other trading activities £4.86k £0 £300 £0 £3.59k
Income - Charitable activities £95.00k £95.00k £104.00k £112.75k £128.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £210.79k £95.33k £171.83k £202.48k £186.26k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £16.53k £7.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £685.92k £695.11k £806.62k £797.34k £822.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k £3.50k £3.63k £4.60k £8.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0