Trustees CARDIFF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1155885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DANIEL COLES Chair 18 February 2014
None on record
Manon Haf Williams Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Zacharay Jacob Arnold Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Helen Susannah Dodoo Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Abdi Farah Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
Rebecca Woolley Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Anisah Johnson Trustee 19 March 2024
None on record
Joanne Green Trustee 23 January 2024
None on record
Olubunmi Ajayi-Obanewa Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record