NEWARK CRUSADER CIO

Charity Number: 1156555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide facilities in the interests of social welfare by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,046
Total expenditure: £20,692

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Jonathan Fearn Trustee 04 June 2021
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWARK ON TRENT ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST LEONARD
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: 16 days late
JAMES WILKINSON Trustee 18 February 2014
NEWARK HERITAGE BARGE CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.17k £3.55k £4.69k £8.14k £20.05k
Total expenditure £9.68k £3.52k £5.41k £15.59k £20.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Newark Marina Ltd
26 Farndon Road
NEWARK
NEWARK
NG24 4SD
Phone:
01636 704022