Accounts and annual returns HILLFIELDS ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1157428
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 28 February 2025 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 23 May 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 27 February 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 24 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required