THE E AND N WATSON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOMINIC HUGH NEVILLE OGDEN | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr CHARLES PHILIP LAWRENCE CLAYTON | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAXWELL BRENDAN JACK | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.78k | £22.65k | £24.08k | £2.77m | £181.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.51k | £13.56k | £109.27k | £773.16k | £427.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.71m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.68m | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £55.74k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £28.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £753.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.04k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £747.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.04k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 January 2021 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALEXANDRA HOUSE
ST JOHNS STREET
SALISBURY
WILTSHIRE
SP1 2SB
- Phone:
- 01722 412412
- Email:
- joyce.salkeld@wilsonsllp.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window