SUSTAINABLE MERTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUSTAINABLE MERTON IS A COMMUNITY LED INITIATIVE GIVING LOCAL RESIDENTS, ORGANISATIONS AND BUSINESSES THE OPPORTUNITY TO STIMULATE PRACTICAL ACTION TO MAKE OUR AREA A SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITY. THE THINKING BEHIND THIS IS SIMPLY THAT A BOROUGH USING ENERGY AND RESOURCES IN A SUSTAINABLE WAY COULD, IF WELL PLANNED AND DESIGNED, BE MORE RESILIENT, MORE ABUNDANT AND MORE PLEASURABLE THAN AT PRESENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £368,909 from 24 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Merton
Governance
- 11 April 2014: CIO registration
- 19 January 2016: Funds received from 1123041 SUSTAINABLE MERTON
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Su Kim-Stroud | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kuziva Punungwe | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anca Tacu | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Laidler | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alysha Simone Randall | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Maries | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Benedict Michael Cuddon | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juliet Dorothy Boyd | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOCTOR GILLIAN LEIGH | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUTH BABER | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.98k | £180.35k | £142.59k | £329.65k | £391.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.83k | £107.54k | £176.94k | £316.42k | £370.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £50.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £37.32k | £50.00k | £124.03k | £306.13k | £368.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AND AROUND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON: (A) THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ENCOURAGING THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES, AND RAISING AWARENESS OF ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH PEAK OIL AND CLIMATE CHANGE AND THE CONSEQUENT NEED TO DEVELOP A LOW CARBON, SUSTAINABLE FUTURE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Boiler House
Morden Hall Park
Morden
Surrey
SM4 5JD
- Phone:
- 02034170476
- Email:
- info@sustainablemerton.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window