Financial history AL MUWASSAT COMMUNITY IN UK

Charity number: 1157321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.25k £232.19k £158.55k £110.75k £120.42k
Total expenditure £41.53k £238.28k £56.83k £55.63k £75.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A