Accounts and annual returns BOSSINGHAM PRE-SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 1156713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 August 2024 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 September 2024 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 April 2023 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 April 2023 294 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 October 2021 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 October 2021 109 days late Download Open in new window