Trustees LEASINGHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 504516
Up to date (29 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Lesley Kyte | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Adams | Trustee | 03 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Bond | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Kyte | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Corbett | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Milligan | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bibby | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Wade Gould | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Cox | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Doherty | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SPENCER | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEILL MURRAY | Trustee | 04 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Stalham | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joan Lawton | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROL TOKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Zena Anderson | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.