LITTLEBOROUGH ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the appreciation, education and involvement in the arts in Littleborough for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively, by the provision of an arts festival, workshops and public concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £23,174 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rochdale
Governance
- 07 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jane Pheasey | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maryanne Royle | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rose Bibby | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Besford | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicol Kennedy | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Clegg | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jackson | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chicot | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Harrison | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rainham | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.93k | £0 | £17.87k | £32.39k | £26.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.15k | £0 | £17.75k | £25.80k | £22.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.57k | N/A | £17.87k | £31.80k | £23.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 May 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE APPRECIATION,EDUCATION AND INVOLVEMENT IN THE ARTS IN LITTLEBOROUGH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT,IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,BY THE PROVISION OF AN ARTS FESTIVAL,WORKSHOPS AND PUBLIC CONCERTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Shore Road
LITTLEBOROUGH
Lancashire
OL15 9LG
- Phone:
- 07747 777759
- Website:
-
littleboroughartsfestival.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window