BIGGA FISH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None for this financial year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 April 2014: Standard registration
- 24 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE CREATIVE ARTS AS A MEANS OF: (A) PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION AND ASSISTING THEM TO ADVANCE IN LIFE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS; AND (C) PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; (D) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT (BY PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window