Financial history BAMPTON HERITAGE AND VISITOR CENTRE

Charity number: 1156194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.85k £6.69k £6.72k £8.06k £9.07k
Total expenditure £4.44k £4.00k £4.30k £5.09k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.25k £1.90k £1.05k N/A N/A