THE CHURCH OF GOD IN SWINDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHURCH SERVICS; FELLOWSHIP LUNCHES; CHARITY LUNCHES; QUIZ NIGHTS FOR CHARITY; ANNUAL CRAFT DAY FOR CHARITY; SILVER SUNDAY EVENT; YOUTH CLUBS ON THURSDAY & FRIDAY NIGHTS DURING TERM TIME; TEENAGE SATURDAY CLUB ACTIVITIES FOR ALL SE CHURCHES; YOUNG CHRISTIANS MEETINGS; YOUTH CAMPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
Governance
- 28 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN GEOFFREY JARVIS | Chair | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LENNIE SHAW | Trustee | 04 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW TUGWELL | Trustee | 04 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN SEDDON | Trustee | 20 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Stanley | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|||||
KEVIN STEPHEN HICKLING | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.12k | £35.12k | £50.49k | £56.00k | £60.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.66k | £34.27k | £38.36k | £51.65k | £58.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND (B) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CIO BY ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAXLANDS MANOR FARM
FLAXLANDS
ROYAL WOOTTON BASSETT
SWINDON
SN4 8DY
- Phone:
- 01793840647
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window