GEORGIA'S CHILDREN OF THE WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set up in memory of Georgia Louise Murray an amazing young woman who cared deeply for others, who we sadly lost in November 2010 to complications in her 3rd open heart operation. Focussing on Water, Healthcare, Education and Nutrition projects for underprivileged children both at home and around the world working with like minded organisations in Manchester, Salford, Cambodia and Romania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Cambodia
- Romania
Governance
- 28 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN MURRAY | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANASTASIA JOANNE BELLAMY | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE MCLENAGHAN | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.28k | £44.06k | £39.16k | £56.04k | £133.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.66k | £37.28k | £27.32k | £34.01k | £131.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY,SICKNESS,DISTRESS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN CAMBODIA AND IN OTHER SUCH COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Woodlea
Worsley
MANCHESTER
M28 2BJ
- Phone:
- 07836722446
- Email:
- info@georgiaschildren.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window