PITSMOOR ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and run a children's adventure playground in the Pitsmoor and Burngreave areas of Sheffield and surrounding areas. To provide facilities for the community in the interests of social welfare and for education, recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,693 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yanina Koszalinski | Chair | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steven Pool | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Belbin | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Nawel Mohsin Obied | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Railton | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
SONAM NAWAZ | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura Watkins | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL PORTMAN | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA SEXTON | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.78k | £215.25k | £171.11k | £216.62k | £203.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.96k | £169.58k | £192.16k | £214.93k | £221.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £18.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.85k | £32.85k | £31.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE PITSMOOR AND BURNGREAVE AREAS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 122 Burngreave Road
Sheffield
S3 9DE
- Phone:
- 01142737121
- Email:
- info@pitsmooradventure.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window