EAST VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1156108
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing space which it has acquired within the Ludwig Guttmann Health Centre under a s.106 agreement. Some space will be let to commercial tenants with the balance provided as a village hall type space for the benefit of residents and workers of the surrounding area to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £38,507
Total expenditure: £35,052

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacquie Holland Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Richard Allen Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
David Burns Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Satbinder Sanghera Trustee 10 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.26k £3.46k £1.15k £7.57k £38.51k
Total expenditure £61.48k £17.67k £55.73k £49.92k £35.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 April 2025 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 August 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Get Living London
5 Celebration Avenue
LONDON
E20 1DB
Phone:
07800565116
Website:

No information available