NTC SCHOOL DE DROOMTORENS

Charity Number: 1158151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

NTC school De Droomtorens provides classes in Dutch language and culture to children in Oxfordshire and surrounding counties.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £40,596
Total expenditure: £38,352

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • DE DROOMTORENS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Arvid Straates Chair 01 April 2020
None on record
Paul Steffens Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Jan Mol Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Frank Schoofs Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £31.43k £34.97k £36.18k £36.48k £40.60k
Total expenditure £36.18k £32.33k £37.83k £45.70k £38.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 07 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. EBBES C OF E FIRST SCHOOL
WHITE HOUSE ROAD
OXFORD
OX1 4NA
Phone:
07770878536