HURSTBOURNE TARRANT COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To build and subsequently manage a community centre for the benefit of the inhabitants of Hurstbourne Tarrant and neighbouring areas without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, age disability, nationality, race or political, religious or other opinions, in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Charles Thomas | Chair | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Hedger | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Pittuck-Schols | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR ANDREW WILLIAM WATSON | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE WILLIS | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN PATRICIA NASH | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.62k | £23.93k | £45.97k | £17.11k | £23.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.86k | £8.34k | £17.93k | £14.66k | £19.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.91k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT PRIMARILY OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HURSTBOURNE TARRANT BUT ALSO OF NEIGHBOURING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION,AGE,DISABILITY,NATIONALITY,RACE OR POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS,LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Recreation Ground
Church Street
Hurstbourne Tarrant
Andover
SP11 0AX
- Phone:
- 07815 082326
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window