Accounts and annual returns RUGBY MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 504527
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 20 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 20 August 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 29 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 04 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 16 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 07 November 2006 On Time