Financial history RUGBY MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 504527
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £222.36k £207.39k £177.87k £211.61k £176.15k
Total expenditure £181.88k £192.73k £242.54k £245.90k £196.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A