RUGBY MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rugby Mind aims to complement the statutory mental health services provided by Social Services and the local Primary Care Trust. Some aspects of the service focus upon recovery, whilst the objective of many of the group activity sessions is to enable clients to maintain positive mental health and to promote social inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 04 September 1975: Standard registration
- 11 October 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 October 2010: Funds transferred to 1003688 Coventry, Warwickshire & Worcestershire Mind
- RUGBY MIND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.36k | £207.39k | £177.87k | £211.61k | £176.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.88k | £192.73k | £242.54k | £245.90k | £196.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 20 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 15 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 04 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 30 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 24 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 07 November 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 1975, UPDATED AT AGM 21/10/2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM A MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH THE NATIONAL BODY OF MIND
Area of benefit
RUGBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window