Governing document HASRET COMMUNITY ART

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/01/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS (INCLUDING TRADITIONAL TURKISH AND KURDISH FOLK ART AND MUSIC) IN PARTICULAR AMONG TURKISH, KURDISH, PERSIAN, ARMENIAN, AND CYPRIOT COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY OR THROUGH: • TRADITIONAL MUSIC, SONG AND FOLK ARTS, STRIVING FOR ACCESSIBILITY, EXCELLENCE AND CREATIVITY IN MUSICAL SAZ (USING THE SAZ BAGLAMA) AND OTHER RELATED MUSIC AND ARTS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY PERFORMANCES; • DEVELOPMENTAL PROJECTS SUCH AS RESIDENCIES, COMMUNITY WORKSHOPS, SCHOLARSHIP AND TRAINING PROGRAMMES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE OR FOR ALL AGE GROUPS AND SKILL LEVELS; • ACTIVITY AND LEARNING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND COURSES WHICH AIM TO ENCOURAGE AWARENESS OF ANATOLIAN SAZ, SAZ MUSIC AND SAZ PRACTICE; AND THROUGH • A RANGE OF RESIDENTIAL COURSES AND NON-RESIDENTIAL CLASSES, EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES THROUGHOUT THE YEAR INCLUDING TRADITIONAL MUSIC, FOLK MUSIC, SONG, STORYTELLING / FOLKLORE AND ARTS & CRAFTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.