THE EDUCATION FUTURES COLLABORATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- INCREASING THE ACCESSIBILITY OF EDUCATION RESEARCH, BEST PRACTICE AND PROFESSIONAL KNOWLEDGE; - ENHANCING NETWORKING AND COLLABORATION AMONGST EDUCATION PROFESSIONALS; - PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING EDUCATION STRATEGIES ESPECIALLY AS TO THE LEARNING OF FUNDAMENTAL CONCEPTS TO ENABLE FURTHER LEARNING; AND - DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE MODELS OF EDUCATION RESEARCH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Brunei
- China
- New Zealand
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Thailand
- United States
Governance
- 17 June 2014: CIO registration
- 19 March 2020: Funds received from 1108807 WORLD ECITIZENS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Sarah Younie | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Procter | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hall | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Blamires | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN NOAKES | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF MARILYN GAIL LEASK | Trustee | 17 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.75k | £5.74k | £21.08k | £39.17k | £20.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78k | £7.19k | £17.68k | £17.01k | £27.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY: - INCREASING THE ACCESSIBILITY OF EDUCATION RESEARCH, BEST PRACTICE AND PROFESSIONAL KNOWLEDGE; - ENHANCING NETWORKING AND COLLABORATION AMONGST EDUCATION PROFESSIONALS; - PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING EDUCATION STRATEGIES ESPECIALLY AS TO THE LEARNING OF FUNDAMENTAL CONCEPTS TO ENABLE FURTHER LEARNING; AND - DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE MODELS OF EDUCATION RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 FIRS ROAD
HOUGHTON-ON-THE-HILL
LEICESTER
LE7 9GU
- Phone:
- 07568520447
- Email:
- enquiries@meshguides.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window