LONDON GAY SYMPHONIC WINDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The LGSW welcome everyone regardless of their sexuality. We are a wind and percussion ensemble run by our members. We provide public concerts that entertain the audience while also developing the skills and talents of our members with repertoire chosen by the membership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 February 2015: Standard registration
- LGSW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mark Campbell | Chair | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Robbins | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Harrison-Carey | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ross Macrae | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Guillaume Marcel Olivier Favier | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Ian Jonathan Preston | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ian Jackson | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.90k | £10.41k | £14.51k | £17.34k | £18.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.64k | £10.12k | £13.90k | £16.16k | £17.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 14/08/2014 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; II. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS; III. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE LGBT COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; B. PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; C. CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Brocklehurst Street
LONDON
SE14 5RA
- Phone:
- 07732248521
- Email:
- lgswcommittee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
lgsw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window