Financial history SPRINGFIELD PARK LEISURE CENTRE

Charity number: 1157246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £79.19k £66.37k £66.89k £69.21k £72.80k
Total expenditure £89.99k £46.99k £92.55k £81.15k £83.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.50k N/A N/A £250