SPECIAL STARS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Special Stars Foundation provides a diverse and vibrant range of inclusive opportunities for people with learning and physical disabilities who cannot access mainstream activities. Our aim is to reduce social isolation, provide meaningful experiences, build confidence and develop new skills. We also offer a variety of learning opportunities, advice and support services for parent carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,947 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 18 March 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Thompson | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Shaw | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hooley | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Deborah Welch | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Watson | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Clark | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.28k | £404.43k | £311.54k | £406.28k | £181.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.41k | £220.07k | £232.63k | £273.43k | £304.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.95k | £7.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 18 MAR 2014 AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGHOUT THE HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE REGION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INCLUSIVE RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, TRAINING AND PRACTICAL ADVICE FOR PARENT CARERS FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, ?ADDITIONAL NEEDS? MEANS A PHYSICAL, SENSORY, COMMUNICATION, BEHAVIOURAL OR LEARNING DISABILITY OR A LIFELONG/ LIFE LIMITING CONDITION.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL CITY EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Special Stars Foundation
F24
Upper Deck
Princes Quay
HULL
HU1 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01482227657
- Email:
- info@heyspecialstars.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window