ENABLE BUSOGA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enable Busoga partners with local communities in Uganda. We promote fruit drying, solar and sustainable forestry businesses. We establish school & church links helping with buildings, educational materials and health needs. The Barbara Project helps children with disability, providing village assessment clinics and essential mobility equipment to promote independence and improved quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Gray | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN TAYLOR | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CLIVE TAYLOR | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|||||
KATY BARNES | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PENNY ALLEN | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.15k | £12.32k | £10.41k | £11.65k | £7.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.43k | £13.14k | £16.85k | £12.35k | £10.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
ENABLE BUSOGA EXISTS FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROGRAMMES AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATON, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 SEYMOUR ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 6RH
- Phone:
- 02380785349
- Email:
- enablebusoga@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window