DAISY CHAINS IW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Daisy Chains IW supports Isle of Wight children and their families when a child has been diagnosed with a life limiting illness, long term health problem or disability this includes premature babies who need to travel to mainland hospitals for treatment/care or therapy, we also help with any costs associated with the treatment/illness/disability and also pay for any equipment or family support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 25 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elyse Rose | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE GROVES | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MICHELLE PLANT | Trustee | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.78k | £49.29k | £33.80k | £45.20k | £67.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.87k | £44.06k | £30.87k | £50.00k | £66.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND NEED FOR CHILDREN THAT SUFFER FROM LONG TERM HEALTH PROBLEMS, A LIFE LIMITING CONDITION, NEED EMERGENCY HOSPITAL TREATMENT OR HAVE A DISABILITY - TO INCLUDE PRE TERM BABIES AND THEIR FAMILIES THAT HAVE BEEN TRANSFERRED TO MAINLAND HOSPITALS THAT ARE RESIDENT ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT, BY: A) PROVIDING AN EMERGENCY TRAVEL GRANT SCHEME FOR CHILDREN WHO NEED ASSISTANCE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES. B) PROVIDING TRAVEL GRANTS FOR CHILDREN AND THEIR PARENTS TO ENABLE THEM TO ACCESS APPOINTMENTS, TREATMENT, THERAPY OR CARE. C) PURCHASING (MEDICAL) AIDS AND EQUIPMENT THAT WILL HELP CHILDREN PROGRESS OR BE MORE COMFORTABLE THAT ARE NOT AVAILABLE ON THE NHS D) PAYING FOR THERAPIES AT THERAPY CENTRES THAT WILL HELP OR AID THE CHILDREN TO PROGRESS OR MAINTAIN THEIR ABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Acre Cottages
Spanners Close
Chale Green
VENTNOR
Isle Of Wight
PO38 2HS
- Phone:
- 07801424645
- Email:
- daisychainsiow@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window