EMPIRE FIGHTING CHANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empire Fighting Chance (EFC) helps young people who are failing at school, in danger of drifting into a life of unemployment or even crime, and helps them turn their lives around. We run intensive mentoring and personal development programmes alongside a physcial activity. EFC perform remedial work on numeracy and literacy,preparation for employment courses,sports and mentoring qualifications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income:
£1,637,221
Donations and legacies | £1.40m | |
Charitable activities | £232.85k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,477,560
Raising funds | £12.73k | |
Charitable activities | £1.46m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £12.73k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.46m | |
Retained for future use | £159.66k |
People

33 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bristol City
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Torfaen
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON NEWITT | Chair | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Campbell | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Phillips | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Crispin Busk | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE ANN LESLIE MP | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £805.54k | £924.53k | £1.40m | £1.18m | £1.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £749.64k | £904.91k | £1.26m | £1.15m | £1.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.52k | £9.19k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £657.65k | £829.02k | £1.26m | £987.02k | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £144.83k | £169.98k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £135.44k | £80.56k | £0 | £0 | £232.85k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £12.45k | £14.96k | £0 | £18.45k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £683.58k | £780.07k | £882.98k | £983.65k | £1.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £66.06k | £60.19k | £15.08k | £22.23k | £12.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £1.44k | £5.54k | £10.04k | £20.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £64.65k | £361.99k | £143.39k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.27k | £17.43k | £26.40k | £28.38k | £22.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £540.85k | £904.87k | £922.87k | £1.55m | £1.81m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.66k | £363.23k | £265.63k | £880.44k | £969.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
1.5 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1.5.1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (II) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 1.5.2 TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE FORM OF AMATEUR BOXING, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; 1.5.3 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PHYSICAL AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (I) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (III) PROMOTING PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH; (IV) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (V) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS; AND 1.5.4 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ILLNESS OR MEDICAL CONDITIONS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PHYSICAL AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES. 1.6 NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mill
Lower Ashley Road
Easton
Bristol
BS5 0YJ
- Phone:
- 01172338700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window