THE ELLA ROBERTA FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ella Roberta Family Foundation (ERFF) campaigns for clean air in the UK and abroad by promoting research & raising awareness of the health impacts of air pollution e.g. asthma. ERFF is campaigning for Clean Air as a Human Right to become a UK law. We hold our own events & speak at UK/ international events to push for change and to highlight clean air social injustice issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £19,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 August 2014: CIO registration
- THE ELLA ROBERTA FAMILY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Hill Steadman | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jane Omololu | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Gray | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Adoo-Kissi-Debrah | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHARON FARNLEY | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £36.36k | £32.84k | £195.86k | £229.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £9.87k | £49.38k | £142.77k | £150.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM SEVERE ASTHMA RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN SOUTH EAST LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, FOR TREATMENT, EDUCATION AND RECREATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, YOUNG PEOPLE IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO SEVERE ASTHMA TO PROMOTE ALL RESEARCH NECESSARY TO FIND THE CAUSE, CURE AND PREVENTION OF SEVERE ASTHMA IN CHILDREN AND TO AID AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITION OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM IT AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbotshall Healthy Life Centre
Abbotshall Road
Catford
SE6 1SQ
- Phone:
- 07502245780
- Email:
- media@ellaroberta.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window