BLACKPOOL PRIDE FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold an annual LGBT Blackpool Pride Festival and other associated fundraising events. The Festival is an inclusive two day event and includes entertainment and market stalls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackpool
Governance
- 17 June 2014: CIO registration
- Pride Blackpool (Working name)
- BPF (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Cheston | Chair | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Roberts | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Louise Buckley | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dewick Day | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.66k | £2.54k | £85.81k | £75.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.34k | £300 | £81.17k | £73.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2022
(These accounts |
23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 April 2022 | 643 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 April 2022 | 643 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ACROSS BLACKPOOL, WYRE AND FYLDE (THE ARE OF BENEFIT) BY:- (A)IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING AND STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL WITH ADDITIONAL SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE LOCAL LGBT BUSINESS AND VOLUNTEER COMMUNITY; (B)CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (C)UNITING THE LGBT COMMUNITY, TOGETHER WITH THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS, SO THEY CAN FEEL SAFE, WELCOMED AND PROUD TO BE THEMSELVES AT OUR EVENTS; (D)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING GENERAL AWARENESS AMONG THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND CHALLENGES FACING THE LIVES OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (E)ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTOR ORGANISATIONS TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE CHARITY FOR LGBT PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (F)APPLYING CAPITAL OR REVENUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PROJECTS, THAT SUPPORT THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL, IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETINGS, FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT. LGBT STANDS FOR LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PEOPLE, AND REFERS TO SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT, BOTH PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS UNDER THE EQUALITY ACT 2010 (HTTP://WWW.HOMEOFFICE.GOV.UK/EQUALITIES/EQUALITY-ACT/).
Area of benefit
ACROSS BLACKPOOL, WYRE AND FYLDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Advance Business Services
Unit 12
Chiswick Court
Chiswick Grove
BLACKPOOL
FY3 9TW
- Phone:
- 07736849162
- Email:
- chair@blackpoolpride.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window