Financial history BAGWORTH COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST (2013) LIMITED

Charity number: 1155947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.08k £24.06k £37.76k £34.74k £33.25k
Total expenditure £33.19k £17.80k £24.90k £39.01k £64.88k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.52k £8.52k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.76k £11.78k £13.16k £7.52k N/A