KUMON Y'ALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kumon Y?all empowers young people to be flag bearers of positive change in their community, Dewsbury.In the past year, we have utilised the energies of 60+ youth for projects that build bridges between the fragmented sections of our community and its surrounding areas. Using sport, We attracted the youth to create projects showing unity in the community.Projects gained regional and national awards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
105 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 10 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUSTAK YUNUS | Chair | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SOKAT ALI PATEL | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHABIR MUSA | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.83k | £42.78k | £62.05k | £42.85k | £51.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.74k | £33.95k | £49.70k | £48.05k | £49.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.30k | £4.90k | £1.26k | £1.32k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2014 as amended on 12 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, PRIMARILY AGED 8 TO 21 IN DEWSBURY SOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THROUGH: A THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS; AND 3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Orchard Street
Dewsbury
WF12 9LT
- Phone:
- 07515634970
- Email:
- enquiries@kumonyall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window