FOURSQUARE GOSPEL CHURCH, ESSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a charity and Faith Organisation, we are focusing on raising ?Creative Youths and Purposeful families?. It is our desire that there will be peace all over UK. We however, operates within London and Essex. Equipping the Youths in our community in Computing, Media technology and Musical Instruments. Also organizing seminars for parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 April 2014: Standard registration
- FGCE (CROWN OF GLORY) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR BAYO LAWAL | Chair | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Akindele Adarijo | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev AKINDELE OGUNDAYISI DIP-THEO | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.42k | £7.21k | £12.98k | £14.25k | £20.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.47k | £10.54k | £8.52k | £15.59k | £20.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 October 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/11/2013
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH DETAILED IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ("THE STATEMENT OF FAITH"); 2. THE RELIEF OF THE POOR, AGED. SICK AND THOSE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
200 Hunters Hall Road
Dagenham
RM10 8HU
- Phone:
- 07720573863
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window