THE WELLSPRING(STOCKPORT) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide food, drinks, clothing and a hot shower every day of the year to homeless and disadvantaged people plus advice on housing, debt, jobs, health( with a nurse available 2 days a week and a doctor 2 days a week) and drugs and alcohol and classes in English, Maths, IT and art. To provide advocacy on benefit and housing appeals. To promote health, safety and confidence building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £67,701 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Derbyshire
- Manchester City
- Stockport
- Tameside
Governance
- THE WELLSPRING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW AYRES | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Joanna Newns | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Whitley | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nicholas Brearley | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Whylie | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Edmund Rackstraw | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY WENT | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|||||
PETER HODSKINSON MBE | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN PAULINE COOKE | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER BURNS | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRENDAN PATRICK JOSEPH COJEEN B.E.M. | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROGER HARDY | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.51k | £509.50k | £352.92k | £491.78k | £419.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £348.52k | £246.18k | £268.41k | £336.03k | £427.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.50k | £67.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £493.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £15.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £18 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £22.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £246.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £8.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS ARISING OF PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS OR AT RISK OF BECOMING HOMELESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORTED HOUSING, AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND RESETTLEMENT OF HOMELESS PEOPLE IN NEED IN STOCKPORT BY ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT OF LIFE SKILLS TO ASSIST THEM INTO INDEPENDENT LIVING AS PART OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN STOCKPORT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES IN ENGLISH AND MATHS. 4.3 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE SUPPORT, CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY. 4.4 SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Wellspring
Harvey Street
Stockport
SK1 1YD
- Phone:
- 01614776344
- Email:
- info@thewellspring.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window