LUDLOW WOMENS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ludlow Womens Centre exists primarily for the benefit of local people in terms of physical, educational, emotional and psychological well-being. It is a community centre with two meeting rooms - one accommodates up to 100 people and the other an intimate space for activities such as meditation, counselling etc. Access by charitable and disability groups is ensured by its location and low costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
Governance
- 11 April 2014: CIO registration
- 11 April 2016: Funds received from 1004071 LUDLOW WOMEN'S CENTRE
- LUDLOW WOMEN'S AND COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Janette Webb | Chair | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Kevill | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Knight | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Walker | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Cox | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Lloyd | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BETTINE WINIFRED HOWES | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROMA ANNE DYKE | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.73k | £1.21k | £8.55k | £13.66k | £16.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.06k | £6.47k | £5.93k | £9.81k | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £300 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 02 July 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 19 April 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LUDLOW, SHROPSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Women's and Community Centre
8 Church Street
LUDLOW
Shropshire
SY8 1AP
- Phone:
- 07977801522
- Email:
- ludlowwomenscentre@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window