HOWICK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity provides a meeting place with kitchen facilities, a large hall and smaller annex, all of which can be hired and/or used for social activities, meetings and education and training purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 11 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chrissy Gray | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Weallans | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Brewis | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracy Louise Collins PhdMSCBSc. | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Roper BsC CENG | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John David Jackson MA | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY GAIL JAMIESON MBE | Trustee | 10 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROSS HAUGHIE | Trustee | 09 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE DOLEMAN MCIPD | Trustee | 02 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
STEWART SEXTON | Trustee | 02 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL SPARK | Trustee | 08 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE ARCHBOLD | Trustee | 05 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
LADY CLARE NICOLETTE HOWICK | Trustee | 05 May 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.87k | £45.11k | £19.90k | £8.78k | £6.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.51k | £42.32k | £2.67k | £4.33k | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06/07/2010
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LONGHOUGHTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 HOWICK GARDENS
HOWICK HALL
HOWICK
ALNWICK
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE66 3LB
- Phone:
- 01665577797
- Email:
- howickvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
howickvillagehall.moonfruit.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window