Trustees HOWICK VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1156634

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chrissy Gray | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Weallans | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Brewis | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracy Louise Collins PhdMSCBSc. | Trustee | 13 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Roper BsC CENG | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John David Jackson MA | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY GAIL JAMIESON MBE | Trustee | 10 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROSS HAUGHIE | Trustee | 09 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOUISE DOLEMAN MCIPD | Trustee | 02 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
STEWART SEXTON | Trustee | 02 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL SPARK | Trustee | 08 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE ARCHBOLD | Trustee | 05 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
LADY CLARE NICOLETTE HOWICK | Trustee | 05 May 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.