TIRION GROUP LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of affordable homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 December 2014: Standard registration
- 31 July 2018: Removed (Exempt charity)
- TAI TIRION LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 24 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION, TOGETHER WITH ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY, AGE, DISABILITY (WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL OR LEARNING DISABILITY) OR SICKNESS; 2) TO PREVENT POVERTY AMONGST THESE GROUPS MORE GENERALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window